Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 10/06/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/06/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 10/06/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/06/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 10/06/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/06/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 10/06/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 10/06/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 10/06/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/15/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/06/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/28/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/16/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/07/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/19/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/09/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/26/2012