There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Buffett Rule Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for taxpayers making donations with their returns of income tax to the Federal Government to pay down the public debt.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/06/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
10/06/2011Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/12/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 10/12/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/12/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/12/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/12/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 10/12/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/12/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/12/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 10/12/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/12/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/12/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 10/12/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/12/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/12/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/12/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/12/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 10/12/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/12/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/12/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/12/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 10/12/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/12/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 10/12/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/12/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 10/12/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/12/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/13/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/13/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 10/13/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/18/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/19/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/01/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 11/15/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/16/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/16/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/09/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance10/06/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1676. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/06/2011)

Buffett Rule Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow taxpayers to donate an amount (not less than $1), in addition to any tax owed, which shall be deposited in the general fund of the Treasury and transferred to an account used to reduce the public debt.  Requires such donation to be designated on a taxpayer's income tax return at the time such return is filed.