Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/12/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 10/12/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/12/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/12/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/12/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 10/12/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/12/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/12/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 10/12/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/12/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/12/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 10/12/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/12/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/12/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/12/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/12/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 10/12/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/12/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/12/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/12/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 10/12/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/12/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 10/12/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/12/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 10/12/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/12/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/13/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/13/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 10/13/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/18/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/19/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/01/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 11/15/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/16/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/16/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/09/2012