Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 10/12/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/12/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 10/12/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/26/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/27/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/21/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/05/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/29/2012