Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/12/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/14/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/19/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/20/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/23/2011