Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/01/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/12/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/13/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/15/2012