Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 10/13/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/17/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/17/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/18/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/31/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 10/31/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/02/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/03/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/07/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/23/2012