Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 10/17/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 10/17/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 10/17/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/18/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/18/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/19/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/07/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/08/2011