Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 10/18/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/08/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/09/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/28/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/01/2011