Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 10/19/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 10/19/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/19/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 10/19/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 10/19/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 10/19/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/31/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/09/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/17/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/17/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/19/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/23/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/07/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/22/2012