Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 10/20/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/30/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/28/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/27/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/30/2012