Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 10/31/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 10/31/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/31/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 10/31/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/31/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/31/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/31/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 10/31/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 10/31/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/08/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 12/06/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/12/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/17/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/22/2012