Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/12/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/12/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/12/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/14/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/16/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/12/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/19/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/26/2012