Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/01/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/10/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/10/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/15/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/17/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/18/2011