Refined by:

Senate Remove

Limit your search

1-25 of 86
  • S.Amdt.2083 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve the bill.
    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2083, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 29 - 70. Record Vote Number: 74.
  • S.Amdt.2082 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To prohibit the Postal Service from closing, consolidating, or reducing the workforce of certain postal facilities.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2082 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2645)
  • S.Amdt.2081   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2080 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Postal Rate Commission to evaluate area mail processing studies.
    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2080 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2644)
  • S.Amdt.2079 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To extend the moratorium on the closing and consolidation of postal facilities or post offices, stations, or branches.
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2079, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 53. Record Vote Number: 77.
  • S.Amdt.2078 to S.Amdt.2073 (which amends S.Amdt.2000)   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 04/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2077 to S.Amdt.2037   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 04/19/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2076 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require that State liaisons for States without a district office are located within their respective States.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2076 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2075   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2074 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve the Postal Service Health Benefits Program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2074 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2692)
  • S.Amdt.2073 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Relative to Medicare educational program for Postal Service employees and retirees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2073 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2691)
  • S.Amdt.2072 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To determine the impact of certain postal facility closures or consolidations on small business.
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2072 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2071 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require reporting regarding retirement processing and modernization.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2071 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modifed: CR S2683)
  • S.Amdt.2070   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2069   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2068   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.2067   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2066 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To appropriately limit the compensation of executives of the Postal Service.
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2066 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2065   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2064   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2063   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
  • S.Amdt.2062   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2061 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To achieve long-term cost-savings by allowing the Postmaster General to reduce the postal workforce through mandatory retirements for eligible employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2061 as modified, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 33 - 65. Record Vote Number: 71. (text as modified: CR S2642)
  • S.Amdt.2060 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide transparency, accountability, and limitations of Government sponsored conferences.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2060 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2059   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1