Limit your search

1-25 of 50
  1. S.Amdt.2082 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To prohibit the Postal Service from closing, consolidating, or reducing the workforce of certain postal facilities.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2082 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2645)
  2. S.Amdt.2079 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To extend the moratorium on the closing and consolidation of postal facilities or post offices, stations, or branches.
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2079, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 53. Record Vote Number: 77.
  3. S.Amdt.2078 to S.Amdt.2073 (which amends S.Amdt.2000)   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 04/19/2012)
  4. S.Amdt.2077 to S.Amdt.2037   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 04/19/2012)
  5. S.Amdt.2076 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require that State liaisons for States without a district office are located within their respective States.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2076 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  6. S.Amdt.2075   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  7. S.Amdt.2074 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve the Postal Service Health Benefits Program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2074 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2692)
  8. S.Amdt.2073 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose Relative to Medicare educational program for Postal Service employees and retirees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2073 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2691)
  9. S.Amdt.2072 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To determine the impact of certain postal facility closures or consolidations on small business.
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2072 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  10. S.Amdt.2071 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require reporting regarding retirement processing and modernization.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2071 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modifed: CR S2683)
  11. S.Amdt.2068   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  12. S.Amdt.2067   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  13. S.Amdt.2066 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To appropriately limit the compensation of executives of the Postal Service.
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2066 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  14. S.Amdt.2065   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  15. S.Amdt.2064   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  16. S.Amdt.2063   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  17. S.Amdt.2062   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  18. S.Amdt.2057   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  19. S.Amdt.2056 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To modify the process for closing or consolidating post offices and postal facilities.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2056 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2637-2638)
  20. S.Amdt.2050 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To maintain all current door delivery point services.
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2050 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  21. S.Amdt.2049 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To allow supervisory and other managerial organizations to participate in the planning and development of changes in, or termination of, pay policies and schedules and fringe benefit programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2049, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 42. Record Vote Number: 75.
  22. S.Amdt.2048   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  23. S.Amdt.2047 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To establish citizen's service protection advocates, to require the Strategic Advisory Commission on Postal Service Solvency and Innovation to study the advisability of the Postal Service entering into inter-agency agreements with respect to post offices, and to require the Postal Service to develop a strategic plan for entering into such inter-agency agreements.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2047 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2648)
  24. S.Amdt.2043 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To strike the limitations on changes to mail delivery schedule, with an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2043, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 56. Record Vote Number: 72.
  25. S.Amdt.2042 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To maintain current delivery time for market-dominant products.
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2042, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 54. Record Vote Number: 80.