Limit your search

1-25 of 35
  1. S.Amdt.2083 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve the bill.
    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2083, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 29 - 70. Record Vote Number: 74.
  2. S.Amdt.2081   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/19/2012)
  3. S.Amdt.2080 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the Postal Rate Commission to evaluate area mail processing studies.
    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2080 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2644)
  4. S.Amdt.2070   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  5. S.Amdt.2069   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  6. S.Amdt.2061 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To achieve long-term cost-savings by allowing the Postmaster General to reduce the postal workforce through mandatory retirements for eligible employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2061 as modified, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 33 - 65. Record Vote Number: 71. (text as modified: CR S2642)
  7. S.Amdt.2060 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To provide transparency, accountability, and limitations of Government sponsored conferences.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2060 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  8. S.Amdt.2059   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  9. S.Amdt.2058 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve access to postal services in communities potentially affected by a postal closing or consolidation.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2058 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2641-2642)
  10. S.Amdt.2055   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  11. S.Amdt.2054   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  12. S.Amdt.2053   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  13. S.Amdt.2052   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  14. S.Amdt.2051   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  15. S.Amdt.2046 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To provide protections for postal workers with respect to their right not to subsidize union nonrepresentational activities.
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2046, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 53. Record Vote Number: 81.
  16. S.Amdt.2045   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  17. S.Amdt.2044   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  18. S.Amdt.2039 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To prohibit employees of the United States Postal Service from engaging in collective bargaining.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2039, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 23 - 76. Record Vote Number: 79.
  19. S.Amdt.2038   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  20. S.Amdt.2033 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To establish the Commission on Postal Reorganization.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2033, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 30 - 69. Record Vote Number: 70.
  21. S.Amdt.2029 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the Postal Service to take into consideration the impact of regulations when developing a profitability plan.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2029 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2687)
  22. S.Amdt.2028 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To establish a pilot program to test alternative methods for the delivery of postal services.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2028, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 35 - 64. Record Vote Number: 78.
  23. S.Amdt.2027 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the closing of post offices in the Capitol Complex.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2027 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  24. S.Amdt.2026   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012)
  25. S.Amdt.2025 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To end the mailbox use monopoly.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2025, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 35 - 64. Record Vote Number: 76.