Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  • S.Amdt.2043 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To strike the limitations on changes to mail delivery schedule, with an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2043, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 56. Record Vote Number: 72.
  • S.Amdt.2042 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To maintain current delivery time for market-dominant products.
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2042, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 54. Record Vote Number: 80.
  • S.Amdt.2034 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide appropriate workers compensation for Federal employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 9
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2034, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 53. Record Vote Number: 73.
  • S.Amdt.2031 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To prohibit the closing of a rural post office unless certain conditions are met and to establish a moratorium on the closing of rural post offices.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 18
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2031 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2643)
  • S.Amdt.2020 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Postal Service to consider the effect of closing or consolidating a postal facility on the ability of the affected community to vote by mail and to provide for a moratorium on the closing or consolidation of post offices and postal facilities to protect the ability to vote by mail.
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2020 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2641)
  • S.Amdt.2005   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 04/17/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2004   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 04/17/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
  • S.Amdt.2003   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] (Submitted 04/17/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1