Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  • S.Amdt.2071 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require reporting regarding retirement processing and modernization.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2071 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modifed: CR S2683)
  • S.Amdt.2043 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To strike the limitations on changes to mail delivery schedule, with an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2043, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 56. Record Vote Number: 72.
  • S.Amdt.2042 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To maintain current delivery time for market-dominant products.
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2042, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 54. Record Vote Number: 80.
  • S.Amdt.2034 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide appropriate workers compensation for Federal employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 9
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2034, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 53. Record Vote Number: 73.
  • S.Amdt.2031 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To prohibit the closing of a rural post office unless certain conditions are met and to establish a moratorium on the closing of rural post offices.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 18
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2031 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2643)