Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.2079 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To extend the moratorium on the closing and consolidation of postal facilities or post offices, stations, or branches.
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2079, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 53. Record Vote Number: 77.
  2. S.Amdt.2071 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require reporting regarding retirement processing and modernization.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2071 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modifed: CR S2683)
  3. S.Amdt.2056 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To modify the process for closing or consolidating post offices and postal facilities.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2056 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2637-2638)
  4. S.Amdt.2040   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
    Cosponsors: 2
  5. S.Amdt.2031 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To prohibit the closing of a rural post office unless certain conditions are met and to establish a moratorium on the closing of rural post offices.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 18
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2031 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2643)