Limit your search

1-4 of 4
  1. S.Amdt.2056 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To modify the process for closing or consolidating post offices and postal facilities.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2056 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2637-2638)
  2. S.Amdt.2043 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To strike the limitations on changes to mail delivery schedule, with an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2043, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 56. Record Vote Number: 72.
  3. S.Amdt.2031 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To prohibit the closing of a rural post office unless certain conditions are met and to establish a moratorium on the closing of rural post offices.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 18
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2031 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2643)
  4. S.Amdt.1975   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 03/27/2012)
    Cosponsors: 6