Limit your search

1-9 of 9
  1. S.Amdt.2039 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To prohibit employees of the United States Postal Service from engaging in collective bargaining.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2039, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 23 - 76. Record Vote Number: 79.
  2. S.Amdt.2038   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/18/2012)
  3. S.Amdt.2029 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the Postal Service to take into consideration the impact of regulations when developing a profitability plan.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2029 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2687)
  4. S.Amdt.2028 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To establish a pilot program to test alternative methods for the delivery of postal services.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2028, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 35 - 64. Record Vote Number: 78.
  5. S.Amdt.2027 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the closing of post offices in the Capitol Complex.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2027 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  6. S.Amdt.2026   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012)
  7. S.Amdt.2025 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To end the mailbox use monopoly.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2025, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 35 - 64. Record Vote Number: 76.
  8. S.Amdt.2024   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012)
  9. S.Amdt.2023   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012)