Limit your search

1-12 of 12
  • S.Amdt.2083 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To improve the bill.
    Sponsor: Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2083, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 29 - 70. Record Vote Number: 74.
  • S.Amdt.2079 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To extend the moratorium on the closing and consolidation of postal facilities or post offices, stations, or branches.
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2079, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 53. Record Vote Number: 77.
  • S.Amdt.2061 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To achieve long-term cost-savings by allowing the Postmaster General to reduce the postal workforce through mandatory retirements for eligible employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2061 as modified, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, the amendment was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 33 - 65. Record Vote Number: 71. (text as modified: CR S2642)
  • S.Amdt.2049 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To allow supervisory and other managerial organizations to participate in the planning and development of changes in, or termination of, pay policies and schedules and fringe benefit programs.
    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2049, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 42. Record Vote Number: 75.
  • S.Amdt.2046 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide protections for postal workers with respect to their right not to subsidize union nonrepresentational activities.
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2046, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 53. Record Vote Number: 81.
  • S.Amdt.2043 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To strike the limitations on changes to mail delivery schedule, with an offset.
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2043, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 56. Record Vote Number: 72.
  • S.Amdt.2042 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To maintain current delivery time for market-dominant products.
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 8
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2042, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 54. Record Vote Number: 80.
  • S.Amdt.2039 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To prohibit employees of the United States Postal Service from engaging in collective bargaining.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2039, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 23 - 76. Record Vote Number: 79.
  • S.Amdt.2034 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide appropriate workers compensation for Federal employees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 9
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2034, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 53. Record Vote Number: 73.
  • S.Amdt.2028 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To establish a pilot program to test alternative methods for the delivery of postal services.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2028, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 35 - 64. Record Vote Number: 78.
  • S.Amdt.2025 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To end the mailbox use monopoly.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2025, under the order of 4/19/2012, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 35 - 64. Record Vote Number: 76.
  • S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] (Submitted 04/16/2012) (Proposed 04/17/2012)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2000 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.