Limit your search

1-21 of 21
  1. S.Amdt.2082 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To prohibit the Postal Service from closing, consolidating, or reducing the workforce of certain postal facilities.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2082 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2645)
  2. S.Amdt.2080 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the Postal Rate Commission to evaluate area mail processing studies.
    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 04/19/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2080 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2644)
  3. S.Amdt.2076 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require that State liaisons for States without a district office are located within their respective States.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2076 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  4. S.Amdt.2074 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve the Postal Service Health Benefits Program.
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2074 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2692)
  5. S.Amdt.2073 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose Relative to Medicare educational program for Postal Service employees and retirees.
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2073 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2691)
  6. S.Amdt.2072 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To determine the impact of certain postal facility closures or consolidations on small business.
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2072 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  7. S.Amdt.2071 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require reporting regarding retirement processing and modernization.
    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2071 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modifed: CR S2683)
  8. S.Amdt.2066 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To appropriately limit the compensation of executives of the Postal Service.
    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2066 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  9. S.Amdt.2060 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To provide transparency, accountability, and limitations of Government sponsored conferences.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2060 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  10. S.Amdt.2058 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve access to postal services in communities potentially affected by a postal closing or consolidation.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2058 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2641-2642)
  11. S.Amdt.2056 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To modify the process for closing or consolidating post offices and postal facilities.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2056 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2637-2638)
  12. S.Amdt.2050 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To maintain all current door delivery point services.
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2050 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  13. S.Amdt.2047 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To establish citizen's service protection advocates, to require the Strategic Advisory Commission on Postal Service Solvency and Innovation to study the advisability of the Postal Service entering into inter-agency agreements with respect to post offices, and to require the Postal Service to develop a strategic plan for entering into such inter-agency agreements.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2047 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2648)
  14. S.Amdt.2036 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To express the sense of the Senate with respect to the closing and consolidation of postal facilities and post offices.
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 04/18/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2036 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  15. S.Amdt.2032 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To appropriately limit the pay of Postal Service executives.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2032 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  16. S.Amdt.2031 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To prohibit the closing of a rural post office unless certain conditions are met and to establish a moratorium on the closing of rural post offices.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2031 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2643)
  17. S.Amdt.2030 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To improve the workers compensation provisions.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2030 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  18. S.Amdt.2029 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the Postal Service to take into consideration the impact of regulations when developing a profitability plan.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2029 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2687)
  19. S.Amdt.2027 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the closing of post offices in the Capitol Complex.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/25/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2027 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  20. S.Amdt.2020 to S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose To require the Postal Service to consider the effect of closing or consolidating a postal facility on the ability of the affected community to vote by mail and to provide for a moratorium on the closing or consolidation of post offices and postal facilities to protect the ability to vote by mail.
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 04/17/2012) (Proposed 04/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/24/12 Amendment SA 2020 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S2641)
  21. S.Amdt.2000   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Purpose In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] (Submitted 04/16/2012) (Proposed 04/17/2012)
    Latest Action: 04/25/12 Amendment SA 2000 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.