Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 11/03/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/30/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/09/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/14/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/16/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/08/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/10/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/24/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/10/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/20/2012