Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 11/03/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 11/03/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/03/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/03/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 11/03/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 11/03/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 11/03/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/10/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/15/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 11/17/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/17/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/28/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/01/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/07/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 01/24/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/14/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/11/2012