There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/07/2011)

Cross State Air Pollution Act - Enacts into law the final rule entitled "Federal Implementation Plans: Interstate Transport of Fine Particulate Matter and Ozone and Correction of SIP Approvals."

Makes such rule effective on: (1) January 1, 2012, for phase I sulfur dioxide and annual nitrogen oxide reductions; (2) May 1, 2012, for ozone season nitrogen oxide reductions; and (3) January 1, 2015, for phase II sulfur dioxide reductions.

Requires compliance with such rule by: (1) April 1, 2014, and annually thereafter for phase I sulfur dioxide and annual nitrogen oxide reductions and ozone season nitrogen oxide reductions; and (2) April 1, 2016, and annually thereafter for phase II sulfur dioxide reductions.