Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/07/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/13/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/09/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/16/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/16/2012