Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 11/08/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/10/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 11/14/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/14/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/22/2012