There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Deepwater Horizon Survivors' Fairness Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Deepwater Horizon Survivors' Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to clarify the applicability of certain maritime laws with respect to the blowout and explosion of the mobile offshore drilling unit Deepwater Horizon.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/05/2012By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 112-245.
11/14/2012Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
01/25/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
12/05/2012By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 112-245.
Action By: Senate
11/14/2012Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 544.
Action By: Senate
11/14/2012Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/08/2011Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/25/2011Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/27/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/25/2011 Referred to
06/08/2011 Markup by
11/14/2012 Reported by S. Rept. 112-245

No related bill information was received for S.183.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.183. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (11/14/2012)

Deepwater Horizon Survivors' Fairness Act - (Sec. 2) Amends federal maritime law formerly known as the Shipowners' Liability Act of 1851 to exclude a claim for personal injury or wrongful death arising from the blowout and explosion of the mobile offshore drilling unit Deepwater Horizon that occurred on April 20, 2010 (the Deepwater Horizon incident), from provisions limiting a vessel owner's liability in specified instances to the value of the vessel and its pending freight.

(Sec. 3) Amends the Death on the High Seas Act to allow a civil action in law or in admiralty against the person or vessel responsible for a Deepwater Horizon incident death. (Current law allows only a civil action in admiralty when death is caused by a wrongful act, neglect, or default.) Authorizes any related recovery to include fair compensation for nonpecuniary loss (care, comfort, companionship, and society) plus a fair compensation for the decedent's pain and suffering. (Current law allows only fair compensation for pecuniary loss sustained by the individuals for whose benefit the action is brought.)

(Sec. 4) Amends the Jones Act to authorize any recovery in a civil action at law against the employer of a seaman who dies from the Deepwater Horizon incident to include fair compensation for nonpecuniary loss, plus a fair compensation for the decedent's pain and suffering. (Current law allows only certain wrongful death and survival claims as is available to railway employees.)

(Sec. 5) Applies this Act to: (1) causes of action and claims arising after April 19, 2010; and (2) actions commenced prior to, on, or after enactment of this Act that have not been finally adjudicated, including appellate review, as of such date.