Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 11/09/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 11/09/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/16/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/24/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/01/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/10/2012