Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/07/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/10/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/04/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/04/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/11/2011