Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 11/10/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 11/10/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 11/10/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/10/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 11/10/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/10/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 11/10/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 11/10/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 11/10/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 11/17/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/06/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/24/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/19/2012