Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/16/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/28/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/07/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/19/2012