Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/16/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 11/16/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 11/17/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/18/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/18/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/29/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/30/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/12/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/24/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/11/2012