Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 11/15/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/17/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/17/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 11/17/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/17/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/05/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/06/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 12/08/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/24/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/06/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/12/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/14/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/26/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/26/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/26/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/14/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/14/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/15/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/21/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/21/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/27/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/17/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/25/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/25/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/25/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 08/01/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/10/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/10/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/10/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/10/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/19/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/19/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/20/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/21/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/21/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/13/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/14/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 11/14/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/15/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/18/2012