Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/16/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 11/16/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/17/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/17/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/18/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/28/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/28/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/01/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/13/2011