Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/16/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 11/16/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 12/13/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/14/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/30/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/15/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/08/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/28/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/16/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/23/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/08/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/22/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/06/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/20/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/21/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/27/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/17/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/01/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 08/02/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/11/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/13/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/13/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/27/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 12/05/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/10/2012