Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 11/17/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/30/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/05/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 12/08/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/24/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/24/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 01/30/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/31/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 01/31/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/01/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/02/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/07/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/07/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/16/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/17/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/27/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/27/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/27/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/29/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/29/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/05/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/08/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/13/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/26/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/23/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/07/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/21/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/23/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/11/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/13/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/14/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/14/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/20/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/10/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/19/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/24/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/25/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/20/2012