Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/17/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 11/17/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 11/17/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/30/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/01/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/06/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 12/06/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/07/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/01/2012