Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 11/17/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 11/17/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 11/17/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 11/17/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 11/17/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/01/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/07/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/13/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/14/2012