Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 11/30/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/07/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/07/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 12/07/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/07/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/07/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/08/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/08/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/08/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/12/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 12/12/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/13/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/13/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/13/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/13/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/14/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/15/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/16/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/23/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/23/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/23/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/23/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/24/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 01/24/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/26/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/26/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/26/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/30/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/30/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 02/01/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/01/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/01/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/01/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/02/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/06/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/06/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/07/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/09/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/09/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/09/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/09/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/09/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 02/13/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 02/13/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 02/14/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/14/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/14/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/16/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/16/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/17/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/27/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/27/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/27/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 02/28/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/05/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/05/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/13/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/20/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 03/22/2012