Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 11/30/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/01/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/13/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 12/13/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 12/13/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 12/13/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/13/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 12/16/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 01/23/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/23/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 01/30/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 02/01/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/27/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/01/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew