Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/01/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/01/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 12/01/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/01/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/05/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 12/13/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/24/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/26/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/01/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/28/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 03/01/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/07/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/08/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/08/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/15/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/15/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/19/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/19/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/20/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/22/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/28/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/23/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/23/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/23/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/24/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/24/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/24/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/25/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/07/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/07/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/09/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/15/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/22/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/24/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/06/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/12/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/13/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/14/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/19/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/26/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/26/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/26/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/28/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/29/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/10/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/10/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/12/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/16/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/17/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/18/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/24/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/24/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/24/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/24/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/24/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/24/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/25/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/25/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/25/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/26/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/26/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/26/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/26/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/26/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/26/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/30/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/30/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/31/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/01/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/01/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/11/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/11/2012