Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 12/05/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 12/05/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 12/05/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 12/05/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/06/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/06/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/09/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/29/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/27/2012