Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 12/06/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 12/06/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 12/06/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/24/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/26/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/01/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/06/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/26/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/24/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/06/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/07/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/11/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/18/2012