Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/26/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/26/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/26/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/14/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/14/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/14/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/17/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/26/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/08/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/11/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/27/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/15/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/02/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/26/2012