There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

European Union Emissions Trading Scheme Prohibition Act of 2011

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

European Union Emissions Trading Scheme Prohibition Act of 2011

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

European Union Emissions Trading Scheme Prohibition Act of 2011

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

European Union Emissions Trading Scheme Prohibition Act of 2011

Short Titles as Introduced

European Union Emissions Trading Scheme Prohibition Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit operators of civil aircraft of the United States from participating in the European Union's emissions trading scheme, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/27/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-200. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2012 Signed by President.
11/16/2012 Presented to President.
11/13/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6330-6331)
09/22/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 9/21/2012 S6612)
08/02/2012 Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-195.
12/07/2011 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
11/27/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-200. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2012 Signed by President.
11/16/2012 Senate Presented to President.
11/13/2012-5:38pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2012-5:38pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6330-6331)
11/13/2012-5:02pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1956.
11/13/2012-5:02pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6330-6334)
11/13/2012-5:02pm House Mr. Mica moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/25/2012-3:31pm House Held at the desk.
09/25/2012-10:07am House Received in the House.
09/24/2012 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
09/22/2012 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/21/2012 S6612)
09/22/2012 Senate The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2012 Senate S.Amdt.2860 Amendment SA 2860 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2012 Senate S.Amdt.2860 Amendment SA 2860 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Merkley. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6611; text: CR 9/21/2012 S6611) To provide for the reassessment by the Secretary of Transportation of a determination that it is in the public interest to prohibit operators of civil aircraft of the United States from participating in the European Union's emissions trading scheme.
09/22/2012 Senate S.Amdt.2859 Amendment SA 2859 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2012 Senate S.Amdt.2859 Amendment SA 2859 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6611; text: CR 9/21/2012 S6611) To prohibit the use of taxpayer dollars to pay taxes and penalties imposed on United States air carriers pursuant to the European Union emissions trading scheme.
09/22/2012 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6611-6612; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR 9/21/2012 S6611)
08/02/2012 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484.
08/02/2012 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-195.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
07/31/2012 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
12/07/2011 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/07/2011 Referred to
07/31/2012 Markup by
08/02/2012 Reported by S. Rept. 112-195
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/20/2012 Legislative interest

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (8)

  • Air quality
  • Aviation and airports
  • Climate change and greenhouse gases
  • Europe
  • European Union
  • International law and treaties
  • International organizations and cooperation

Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1956. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-200 (11/27/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 22, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

European Union Emissions Trading Scheme Prohibition Act of 2011 - Directs the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to prohibit an operator of a U.S. civil aircraft from participating in any emissions trading scheme unilaterally established by the European Union in EU Directive 2003/87/EC of October 13, 2003, in any case in which the Secretary determines such prohibition to be in the public interest, taking into account the impacts on: (1) U.S. consumers, U.S. carriers, and U.S. operators; (2) the economic, energy, and environmental security of the United States; and (3) U.S. foreign relations, including existing international commitments. Requires the Secretary to hold a public hearing at least 30 days before imposing any such prohibition.

Authorizes the Secretary to reassess such a determination at any time. Requires the Secretary to reassess such a determination after: (1) any amendment by the European Union to such Directive, (2) the adoption of any international agreement concerning a worldwide approach to address aircraft emissions, or (3) the enactment of a public law or issuance of a final rule after formal agency rulemaking in the United States to address aircraft emissions.

Provides that the Secretary, the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA), and other appropriate U.S. government officials should use their authority to conduct international negotiations, including negotiations to pursue a worldwide approach to address aircraft emissions, including the environmental impact of aircraft emissions. Requires such officials to take other actions under existing authorities that are in the public interest and that are necessary to hold operators of U.S. civil aircraft harmless from any such scheme. Prohibits such actions from including the obligation or expenditure of any amounts in the Airport and Airway Trust Fund or amounts otherwise made available to DOT or any other federal agency pursuant to appropriations Acts for the payment of any tax or penalty imposed on an operator of U.S. civil aircraft pursuant to such scheme.