Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 12/12/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 12/12/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 12/12/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 12/12/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 12/12/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/15/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/01/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/17/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/21/2012