Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 12/13/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 12/13/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 12/13/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 12/13/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/17/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/27/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/15/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 03/19/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/16/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 04/16/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 08/02/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/28/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 11/28/2012